EP1840407 - Shock absorbers with mounting position protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AL-KO Kober AG Ichenhauser Strasse 14 D-89359 Kötz / DE | [2010/17] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states AL-KO KOBER AG Ichenhauser Strasse 14 D-89359 Kötz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friess, Gerhard Plaza Euskal Herria, 3-6C 48340 Amorebieta / ES | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Ernicke & Ernicke Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005656.9 | 20.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | DE20062004598U | 21.03.2006 Original published format: DE 202006004598 U | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840407 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840407 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/54, F16F9/06, B60G13/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F16F9/54 (EP);
B60G13/001 (EP);
F16F9/062 (EP);
F16F9/3207 (EP);
F16F9/38 (EP);
B60G2204/128 (EP);
B60G2204/129 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Stoßdämpfer mit Einbaulagensicherung | [2007/40] | English: | Shock absorbers with mounting position protection | [2007/40] | French: | Amortisseur doté d'une protection de position de montage | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | MT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | FI | 28.04.2010 | |
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9317255 (MONROE AUTO EQUIPMENT CO [US]) [A] 12-17* the whole document *; | [X]FR2779196 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,12 * figures 1,7 *; | [XAY]DE10108686 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; claim 1 * [A] 6 [Y] 3-5; | [Y]DE10359638 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028]; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO9317255 | FR2779196 | DE19823878 | DE10108686 | DE10359638 |