EP1973057 - Device for marking and identifying objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gent, Hartmut Hofmannstrasse 75c 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Benz, Jürgen Kanzlei Heumann, Benz Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Benz, Jürgen Kanzlei Heumann, Benz, Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005742.7 | 21.03.2007 | [2008/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973057 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K19/06 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G06K19/06 (EP);
G06K7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Kennzeichnen und Identifizieren von Gegenständen | [2008/39] | English: | Device for marking and identifying objects | [2008/39] | French: | Dispositif de caractérisation et d'identification d'objets | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3308278 (ZEPPELLINI SERGE [FR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 5 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 3 * * claims 1-10 * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]FR2565006 (BASSAT YVES [FR]) [X] 1,14,15 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 10; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO03032242 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,14,15* page 4, lines 8-27; figures 1-7 * | Examination | US4274006 | US5592527 |