EP1972793 - Method for detecting faults in pumping units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Management A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7 - 11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Børsting, Hakon Hjordalsvej 9530 Stovring / DK | 02 /
Munk, Flemming Fallevej 34 8800 Viborg / DK | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005995.1 | 23.03.2007 | [2008/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972793 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972793 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F04D29/66 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
F04D15/0066 (EP,US);
F04D15/0088 (EP,US);
F04D29/669 (EP,US);
F05D2270/709 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion von Fehlern in Pumpenaggregaten | [2008/39] | English: | Method for detecting faults in pumping units | [2008/39] | French: | Procédé de détection de défauts dans des unités de pompage | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IE | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | MT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | LU | 23.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
LU | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
LU | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3520734 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) [X] 1,8 * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2298239 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 1,8 * page 8, line 8 - line 26 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 11 * * page 12, line 25 - page 14, line 8; figures 1,2a; claims 1,2,4 *; | [X]WO9708459 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 29, line 16 - page 30, line 25; figure 2k *; | [X]WO2006127939 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figure 13 * | by applicant | DE3520734 | GB2298239 | WO9708459 | WO2006127939 |