Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1839604
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.08.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
31.08.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
27.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.04.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2010 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
09.05.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
07.05.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
11.03.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |