Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8702723 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B2 | US2007260265 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006016002 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1839604 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2012 | B1 | EP1839604 | 03.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006016002 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006016002 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006016002 | 30.03.2006 |