EP1839792 - Saw blade with a carrier and teeth with cutting edges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG. Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg, Dr. Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | 02 /
Gross, Klaus Edith-Stein-Strasse 17 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006127.0 | 24.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | DE20061015278 | 01.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006015278 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839792 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1839792 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/04, B23D61/14 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B23D61/04 (EP);
B23D61/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Sägeblatt mit einem Grundkörper und Zähnen mit Schneiden | [2007/40] | English: | Saw blade with a carrier and teeth with cutting edges | [2007/40] | French: | Lame de scie dotée d'un corps de base et de dents ayant une lame de coupe | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | MT | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/05] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
MT | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US820969 (GRELCK HEINRICH [DE]) [Y] 6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3730038 (FARB J) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 3; figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH01135413 (OCHIAI YOSHIO) [Y] 7* abstract *; | [Y]EP1205274 (KULLMANN WIKUS SAEGENFAB [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1-11 * | by applicant | WO0119578 | DE202005006613U | DE10393472T |