EP1862049 - Agricultural machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik Ges.m.b.H. Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik GmbH Industriegelände 1 4710 Grieskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldinger, Markus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Waldweg 18 4084 St. Agatha / AT | 02 /
Baldinger, Martin, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Bahnfeld 25 4722 Peuerbach / AT | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Rechtsanwälte-Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006417.5 | 28.03.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | DE20061025699 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006025699 | [2007/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862049 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/00, A01D41/127, G05D1/02 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
A01D41/1278 (EP);
A01B73/044 (EP);
G05D1/0255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | Landmaschine | [2007/49] | English: | Agricultural machine | [2007/49] | French: | Machine agricole | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2455836 (CLAAS MASCHF GMBH GEB) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5155983 (SHEEHAN RONALD T [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 66 * * column 21, lines 52-66 * * abstract *; | [A]US5606504 (ANDERSEN DAVID P [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1332659 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1813142 (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [E] 1* abstract * |