Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1840400 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1840400



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(35)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
27.11.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.12.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.10.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.10.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
08.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
29.05.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
31.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.10.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.09.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
09.09.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.04.2007 Authorisation Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.04.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
18.04.2007 Priority document Search / examination 20
30.03.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
30.03.2007 Description Search / examination 10
30.03.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.03.2007 Drawings Search / examination 1
30.03.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
29.03.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
29.03.2007 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 17