19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
07.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] |
15.10.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
24.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
17.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
04.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
06.11.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
03.11.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.11.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.06.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.05.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
02.05.2008 |
First examination report |
|
29.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
07.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |