EP1981186 - Method of and system for receiving and filtering data which are transmitted in multiple cycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpine Electronics, Inc. 1-1-8 Nishi Gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kern, Alexander c/o Alpine Electronics R&D Europe GmbH Vor dem Lauch 14 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006577.6 | 29.03.2007 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981186 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981186 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04H20/16, // H04H60/25 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04H20/16 (EP);
G08G1/092 (EP);
G08G1/093 (EP);
H04H20/55 (EP);
H04H40/27 (EP);
H04H60/25 (EP);
H04H60/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Gewinnung und Filterung von Daten, die in mehreren Zyklen übertragen werden | [2008/42] | English: | Method of and system for receiving and filtering data which are transmitted in multiple cycles | [2008/42] | French: | Procédé et système pour recevoir et filtrer les données transmises dans plusieurs cycles | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4207664 (SPENGLER REINHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]JP2000035913 (NEC SOFTWARE NAGANO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [DA]EP1150449 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006179367 (CHO HAE-JIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 3; claims 1,8 * |