EP1975680 - Illumination device and method for illuminating uniformly an image generating micro display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Facius, Zoltan SONY Deutschland GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006775.6 | 31.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975680 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/48, H04N9/31, G03H1/32, G03B21/40, G02B27/02, G02B27/09 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
G03H1/32 (EP,US);
G02B27/0944 (EP,US);
G02B27/48 (EP,US);
G02B5/1828 (EP,US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B21/208 (EP,US);
G03B33/12 (EP,US);
H04N9/3152 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US);
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G03H1/08 (EP,US);
G03H1/0808 (EP,US);
G03H1/2294 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2297 (EP,US);
G03H2001/261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum gleichmäßigen Beleuchten einer bilderzeugenden Mikroanzeige | [2008/40] | English: | Illumination device and method for illuminating uniformly an image generating micro display | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage et procédé pour éclairer une image de manière uniforme pour générer un micro-affichage | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 02.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1734771 (SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-19 * figure 2a *; | [X] - SLINGER C ET AL, "ELECTRICALLY CONTROLLABLE MULTIPLE, ACTIVE, COMPUTER-GENERATED HOLOGRAM", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970715), vol. 22, no. 14, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1113 - 1115, XP000699837 [X] 20 * the whole document * | [A] - KRUEGER S ET AL, "Liquid crystal display as dynamic diffractive element", PROJECTION DISPLAYS VII 24-25 JAN. 2001 SAN JOSE, CA, USA, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng USA, (2001), vol. 4294, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 84 - 91, XP002445802 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.420789 | [A] - WANG L ET AL, "SPECKLE REDUCTION IN LASER PROJECTION SYSTEMS BY DIFRACTIVE OPTICALELEMENTS", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19980401), vol. 37, no. 10, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1770 - 1775, XP000754330 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.37.001770 | [A] - TRISNADI J I, "Hadamard speckle contrast reduction", Optics Letters Opt. Soc. America USA, (20040101), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 11 - 13, XP002445803 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.29.000011 |