EP1854997 - Ignition device for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OHG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Markus Rofansiedlung 498a 6200 Wiesing / AT | 02 /
Gschirr, Arno Haymongasse 5 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 03 /
Kröll, Markus Nr. 30 6295 Ginzling / AT | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 07006780.6 | 31.03.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | AT20060000819 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: AT 8192006 | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854997 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1854997 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854997 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/045, F02P9/00, F02P3/05, F02P3/055 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
F02P9/007 (EP,US);
F02P3/051 (EP,US);
F02P3/0554 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Zündeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/46] | English: | Ignition device for a combustion engine | [2007/46] | French: | Dispositif d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.02.2011 | CZ | 02.02.2011 | DK | 02.02.2011 | EE | 02.02.2011 | FI | 02.02.2011 | HU | 02.02.2011 | IE | 02.02.2011 | LT | 02.02.2011 | LV | 02.02.2011 | MT | 02.02.2011 | RO | 02.02.2011 | SE | 02.02.2011 | SI | 02.02.2011 | SK | 02.02.2011 | TR | 02.02.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | LU | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | BG | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | IS | 02.06.2011 | PT | 02.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
TR | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
LU | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
LU | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.02.2011 | |
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1173288 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-3,20 * figure 1; claim 1 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 50 * [Y] 4-9,11,12,18,19,21,22; | [A]WO9013742 (CUMBUSTION ELECTROMAGNETICS [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 19, column 22 - page 20, column 19 *; | [Y]DE4303030 (COLTEC IND INC [US]) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 44 *; | [Y]DE10034725 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [Y] 9,11,12,21,22 * abstract * * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 50 *; | [Y]US6283104 (ITO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-8,19 * abstract * * column 7, line 48 - column 9, line 12 *; | [Y]EP1199470 (JENBACHER AG [AT]) [Y] 9,11,18,21,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Capacitor discharge ignition system having extended burn time", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (199201), vol. 333, no. a, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007117219 [A] 1,2,6,7,9,11,18-22 * the whole document * |