EP1803365 - Footwear sole component with a single sealed chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD One Bowerman Drive Beaverton Oregon 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swigart, John F. 14024 N.W. Eagleridge Lane Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Wallis, Naomi Rachel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07006854.9 | 08.05.2003 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20020143745 | 09.05.2002 Original published format: US 143745 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803365 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803365 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/20, A43B13/18, A43B7/14 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A43B7/144 (EP,US);
A43B13/20 (EP,KR,US);
A43B13/18 (KR);
A43B13/187 (EP,US);
A43B13/189 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | A43B13/20, A43B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schuhsohle-Bestandteil mit einer einzigen abgeschlossenen Kammer | [2007/27] | English: | Footwear sole component with a single sealed chamber | [2007/27] | French: | Semelle de chaussure dotée d'une seule cavité étanche | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03724505.7 / EP1501384 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030724505) is 22.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2003 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IE | 08.05.2018 | LU | 08.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 08.05.2003 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE352216 (ALWIN BAERSCHNEIDER) [A] 1,13,14,23,24,30,37,45* the whole document *; | [XA]US3724106 (MAGIDSON H) [X] 1-3,9,23,24,30 * column 6, line 47 - line 59; figures 1-3,6,9 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 21 * [A] 13,14,37,45; | [XA]WO9703582 (DIADORA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11,23,24,30 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 12; figures 2,4 * [A] 13,14,37,45; | [A]WO0119211 (REEBOK INT LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14,23,24,30,37,45 * page 18, line 8 - line 28; figures 1,14 *; | [A]EP0780064 (BROOKS SPORTS INC [US]) [A] 1,13,14,23,24,30,37,45 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9111931 | US5685090 |