blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1845318

EP1845318 - Method for monitoring a flow safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.11.2017
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vaillant GmbH
Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
[2007/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Hans-Willi
Starenweg 31a
42659 Sollingen / DE
 [2007/42]
Representative(s)Hocker, Thomas
Vaillant GmbH
Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]Hocker, Thomas
Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
Application number, filing date07006941.403.04.2007
[2007/42]
Priority number, dateAT2006000061310.04.2006         Original published format: AT 6132006
[2007/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1845318
Date:17.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1845318
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationIPC:F24H9/20
[2007/42]
CPC:
F24H9/205 (EP,US); F23M9/006 (EP); F23N5/242 (EP);
F24H15/235 (EP,US); F24H15/254 (EP,US); F24H15/36 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/42]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Strömungssicherung[2007/42]
English:Method for monitoring a flow safety device[2007/42]
French:Procédé de surveillance d'un dispositif de sécurité à écoulement[2007/42]
Examination procedure29.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/35]
29.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/16]
07.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
19.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2076574  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO) [X] 1,3-5* page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 38; figure 1 *
ExaminationDE3020228
 EP0175890
 DE9105984U
 DE9210859U
 EP0881439
 EP0905458
 DE69606735T
by applicantGB2076574
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.