EP1842505 - Packaging device for implant screws [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | Packaging device for implant screws and storage system for surgical instruments, implants and screw packaging | ||
[2008/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICON EG CHIRURGIEMECHANIKER-GENOSSENSCHAFT Gänsäcker 15 D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burger, Andreas Konzenbergstrasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
Wenzler, Klaus Daimlerstrasse 19 78665 Frittlingen / DE | 03 /
Schröder, Kristine Am Risibrunnen 11 78567 Fridingen / DE | 04 /
Hettich, Petra Bahnhofstrasse 56 78665 Frittlingen / DE | 05 /
Liebermann, Karl-Ernst Rosenweg 4 78570 Mühlheim / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Mammel, Ulrike Mammel & Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2007/41] | Application number, filing date | 07007013.1 | 04.04.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061016866 | 07.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006016866 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842505 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1842505 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842505 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/02, A61C19/02, A61L2/26 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
A61C8/0087 (EP);
A61B17/865 (EP);
A61B50/20 (EP);
A61B50/24 (EP);
A61B50/30 (EP);
A61C19/02 (EP);
A61L2/07 (EP);
A61L2/26 (EP);
A61B2050/0059 (EP);
A61B2050/3007 (EP);
A61B50/33 (EP);
A61L2202/17 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Verpackungsvorrichtung für Implantatschrauben | [2008/44] | English: | Packaging device for implant screws | [2008/44] | French: | Dispositif d'emballage pour vis d'implant | [2008/44] |
Former [2007/41] | Verpackungsvorrichtung für Implantatschrauben und Lagerungssystem für chirurgische Instrumente, Implantate und Schraubenverpackungen | ||
Former [2007/41] | Packaging device for implant screws and storage system for surgical instruments, implants and screw packaging | ||
Former [2007/41] | Dispositif d'emballage pour vis d'implant et système de stockage pour instruments chirurgicaux, implants et emballages de vis | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08006951.1 / EP1946719 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | IE | 15.04.2009 | LT | 15.04.2009 | LV | 15.04.2009 | MT | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | IS | 15.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 15.04.2009 | |
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
MT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 15.04.2009 | |
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
MT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
MT | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 15.04.2009 | |
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 15.04.2009 | |
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5829590 (KLEIN PHILIP B [US]) [A] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9902196 (RILEY MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 10,17 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 22 ** figure 1 *; | [A]DE19735147 (VER DENTALWERKE ANTAEOS [DE]) [A] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1023909 (POLY VAC INC [US]) [A] 10,16-18 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 3, paragraph 8 - column 5, paragraph 13 * * figure 3 *; | [XY]US6116452 (HAMEL ROSS JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 10,16-18 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 52 * * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 28 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 11-15; | [XA]US6138850 (BERRY III BERNIE B [US]) [X] 10,16,17 * column 2, line 37 - column 6, line 8 * * figures 1A,1B * [A] 18; | [YA]DE10230519 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 11-14 * the whole document * [A] 10,17,18; | [YA]US6783004 (RINNER JAMES A [US]) [Y] 15 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 17 * * figure 3 * [A] 10; | [DX]WO2005092231 (CANDRIAN KARINA [CH], et al) [DX] 1-8 * page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 5 * * figure 11 *; | [A]GB2418421 (STRYKER LEIBINGER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3-8 * page 2, lines 19-21 * * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 8 * * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 2 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6116452 | US6138850 | DE69724045T | EP1864505 |