EP1798466 - Vehicle headlight equipped with a gas discharge lamp and improved means for electromagnetic shielding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2015/20] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billot, Gérard Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2015/20] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
Billot, Gérard Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Tran, Chi-Hai, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Tran, Chi-Hai, et al Valeo Vision S.A.S Siège Social 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/28] | Tran, Chi-Hai, et al Valeo Vision S.A.S Siège Social 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Renous Chan, Véronique Valeo Vision, 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07007020.6 | 29.06.2000 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | FR19990008549 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9908549 | [2007/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798466 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1798466 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V25/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F21V25/00 (EP,US);
F21S41/17 (EP,US);
F21S41/192 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, SE [2015/20] |
Former [2007/25] | DE, ES, IT, SE | Title | German: | Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit einer Gasentladungslampe und einer verbesserten, elektromagnetischen Abschirmung | [2007/25] | English: | Vehicle headlight equipped with a gas discharge lamp and improved means for electromagnetic shielding | [2007/25] | French: | Projecteur de véhicule automobile équipé d'une lampe à décharge et de moyens de blindage électromagnétique perfectionnés | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00401850.3 / EP1065438 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000401850) is 22.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/08] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2710131 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1,28 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 10 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19737640 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,28 * column 2, line 47 - line 64 * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 32 ** figure 1 *; | [A]WO9838708 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,28 * page 7, line 1 - line 29 * * page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 23 * * figures 1,5-7,9 *; | [A]EP0905441 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1,28 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 39 * * figure - * |