EP1977677 - Endoscopic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körner, Eberhard, Dipl.-Ing. Stephan-Gerlach-Strasse 29 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007041.2 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977677 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977677 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61B1/0056 (EP,US);
A61B1/00071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Endoskopisches Instrument | [2008/41] | English: | Endoscopic instrument | [2008/41] | French: | Instrument endoscopique | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.08.2009 | CZ | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IE | 19.08.2009 | LT | 19.08.2009 | LV | 19.08.2009 | MT | 19.08.2009 | PL | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | SK | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | IS | 19.12.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | HU | 20.02.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
MT | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
MT | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
MT | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IT | 04.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
IT | 04.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
CZ | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SK | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
LT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LV | 19.08.2009 | ||
PL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 19.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0535847 (MACHIDA ENDOSCOPE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 10* Zusammenfassung *; | [YD]DE19534112 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [YD] 2,3,5,7,11,12 * column 5, lines 22-38; figures 3-11 *; | [A]DE19928272 (EP FLEX FEINWERKTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,3,5,6,11,12 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US6364828 (YEUNG HUBERT K [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,7,11,12 | by applicant | DE19534112 | US6364828 |