EP1939290 - Gene expression control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75005 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | |||
For all designated states MUSEUM NATIONAL D'HISTOIRE NATURELLE 57, rue Cuvier 75005 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helene, Claude 14 quai d'Orléans 75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
Giovannangeli, Carine 16 rue Larrey 75005 Paris / FR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Dernoncour, Roxane Aventis Pharma S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Dernoncour, Roxane AVENTIS PHARMA S.A. 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07007057.8 | 27.12.1994 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | FR19930015798 | 29.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315798 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939290 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939290 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713, // C12N15/86 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/1132 (EP,US);
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/152 (EP,US);
C12N2310/53 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US);
C12N2310/532 (EP,US);
Y10S977/802 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | C12N15/11, A61K31/713 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2008/27] | Title | German: | Steuerung der Expression von Genen | [2008/27] | English: | Gene expression control | [2008/27] | French: | Contrôle de l'expression de gènes | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95905172.3 / EP0737248 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950905172) is 04.05.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application was refused due to failure to file the sequence listing | 17.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9106626 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 4 - page 5 * * example 8 *; | [XY]WO9219732 (GENSET SA [FR]) [X] 21-23 * page 17 - page 18 * * page 24 - page 25 * * page 33; figures 1,5; claim - * [Y] 1-11; | [A]WO9312230 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 8, line 25 - line 31 * * page 28 - page 33 * * figures 12b,13; claims 19-23 *; | [YD]FR2687411 (NICE SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS UNIVERSI [FR]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X] - ROBERTS R W ET AL, "STABILITY AND PROPERTIES OF DOUBLE AND TRIPLE HELICES: DRAMATIC EFFECTS OF RNA OR DNA BACKBONE COMPOSITION", SCIENCE, (19921127), vol. 258, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1463 - 1466, XP002026847 [X] 1-4,7-10,12,19-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1279808 | [A] - GIOVANNANGELI C ET AL, "OLIGONUCLEOTIDE CLAMPS ARREST DNA SYNTHESIS ON A SINGLE-STRANDED DNA TARGET", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (199311), vol. 90, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10013 - 10017, XP002007115 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.21.10013 | [AD] - GIOVANNANGELI C ET AL, "Single-stranded DNA as a target for triple-helix formation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1991), vol. 113, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7775 - 7777, XP002089280 [AD] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00020a058 | [A] - MILLIGAN J F ET AL, "Oligoribonucleotide synthesis using T7 RNA polymerase and synthetic DNA templates", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19871111), vol. 15, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 8783 - 8798, XP002360370 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - KANDIMALLA EKAMBAR R ET AL, "Single-strand-targeted triplex formation: Stability, specificity and RNase H activation properties", GENE, (1994), vol. 149, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 115 - 121, XP002511320 |