EP1842766 - Meter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2010/24] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satake, Hidenori c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Wakamatsu, Katsumitsu c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2009/49] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
Satake, Hidenori Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
Wakamatsu, Katsumitsu Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007230.1 | 05.04.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | JP20060105418 | 06.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006105418 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842766 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842766 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62J99/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B62J50/225 (EP);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | B62J39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Zählereinrichtung | [2007/41] | English: | Meter device | [2007/41] | French: | Dispositif de compteur | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | BE | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | CZ | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | EE | 16.06.2010 | FI | 16.06.2010 | HU | 16.06.2010 | IT | 16.06.2010 | LT | 16.06.2010 | LV | 16.06.2010 | MT | 16.06.2010 | NL | 16.06.2010 | PL | 16.06.2010 | RO | 16.06.2010 | SE | 16.06.2010 | SI | 16.06.2010 | SK | 16.06.2010 | TR | 16.06.2010 | BG | 16.09.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | ES | 27.09.2010 | IS | 16.10.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
HU | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
TR | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 16.09.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
MT | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
BE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
EE | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
IT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
NL | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
RO | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
SK | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 16.10.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
FI | 16.06.2010 | ||
LT | 16.06.2010 | ||
LV | 16.06.2010 | ||
PL | 16.06.2010 | ||
SE | 16.06.2010 | ||
SI | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0632270 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1496241 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * |