EP1844940 - Image forming apparatus, optical scanning apparatus, and auto light power control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/01] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobue, Fumitaka c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007263.2 | 06.04.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | JP20060110104 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006110104 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844940 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1844940 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844940 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/447, B41J2/455, B41J2/47 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
H04N1/053 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04762 (EP);
H04N2201/04791 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H04N2201/04791, H04N2201/04762 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/11] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung, optische Scanvorrichtung und automatisches Verfahren zur Steuerung der Beleuchtungsleistung | [2007/42] | English: | Image forming apparatus, optical scanning apparatus, and auto light power control method | [2007/42] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images, procédé de lecture optique et procédé de contrôle de la puissance lumineuse | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/19] | IT | 06.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5812299 (MINAKUCHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6483529 (ITO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 16 *; | [X]US2004008248 (IIMA MITSUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | US5812299 | US6483529 | US2004008248 |