EP1800686 - Anionic polymers as toxin binders and antibacterial agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENZYME CORPORATION One Kendall Square, 1400 Bldg Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurtz, Caroline 40 Stone Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 02 /
Fitzpatrick, Richard 23 Pickwick Road Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
Kurtz, Caroline 25 Lincoln Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | ||
02 /
Fitzpatrick, Richard 23 Pickwick Road Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07007479.4 | 11.05.2000 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US19990133975P | 13.05.1999 Original published format: US 133975 P | US20000541268 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: US 541268 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800686 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1800686 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/765, A61P31/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K31/74 (EP);
A61K31/795 (EP);
A61K38/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/74, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/795, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/14, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | A61K31/765 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/26] | Title | German: | Anionische Polymere als Toxinbinder und antibakterielle Wirkstoffe | [2007/26] | English: | Anionic polymers as toxin binders and antibacterial agents | [2007/26] | French: | Polymères anioniques en tant que liants de toxine et agents antibactériens | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00930620.0 / EP1189622 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000930620) is 18.04.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1466702 (SANDOZ LTD) [A] * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * claim 1 *; | [X]GB1576016 (ROHM & HAAS) [X] 1-5 * example 6; table 1 *; | [X]EP0322209 (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *; | [A]EP0402062 (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]); | [A]FR2669535 (MEDGENIX GROUP SA [BE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 *; | [X]WO9305816 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 4 *; | [A]EP0671162 (YU RUEY J [US], et al) [A] * claims 1,7 * * page 7, line 11 * |