Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
02.03.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.12.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
09.10.2009 | Resumption | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
17.04.2009 | Interruption | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
21.11.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.09.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |