EP1848047 - Transitioning the state of phase change material by annealing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossnagel, Stephen M. 49 Ashland Avenue Pleasantville, NY 10570-2301 / US | 02 /
Philipp, Jan Boris 5601 Manor Drive Peekskill, NY 10566 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007521.3 | 12.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | US20060406699 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: US 406699 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848047 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H10N70/231 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/884 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/28185 (KR);
H10N70/041 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/8828 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Übergang des Zustands von Phasenwechselmaterial durch Ausglühen | [2007/43] | English: | Transitioning the state of phase change material by annealing | [2007/43] | French: | Transition de l'état du matériau de changement de phase par recuit | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.04.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/21] | 23.11.2009 | Resumption of proceedings | [2009/46] | 01.04.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/46] |