EP1864675 - Orally administered peptides to ameliorate atherosclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states The UAB Research Foundation 701 South 20th Street Suite 1120G Birmingham, AL 35291-0111 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states The UAB Research Foundation 701 South 20th Street Suite 1120G Birmingham, AL 35291-0111 / US | |||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fogelman, Alan M. 481 Hillgreen Drive Beverly HIlls, CA 90212-4107 / US | 02 /
Navab, Mohammad 1135 North Bundy Drive Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | 03 /
Anantharamaiah, Gattadahalli M. 3798 Carlsbrooke Drive Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07007775.5 | 23.08.2001 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | US20000645454 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: US 645454 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864675 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864675 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/03, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61K38/17, C07K14/775 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Oral verabreichte Peptide zur Linderung von Atherosklerose | [2007/50] | English: | Orally administered peptides to ameliorate atherosclerosis | [2007/50] | French: | Peptides administrés oralement pour améliorer l'athérosclérose | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01966198.2 / EP1318828 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IE | 23.08.2011 | LU | 23.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.08.2011 | ||
LU | 23.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5344822 (LEVINE DANIEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 25 - line 30; figure 4 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO9916408 (DASSEUX JEAN LOUIS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 117; example 6; sequence 243 *; | [A]WO9916409 (DASSEUX JEAN LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* tables VI,VIII; sequence 243 * | by applicant | US4643988 | - GARBER ET AL., ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND THROMBOSIS, (1992), vol. 12, pages 886 - 894 | - LEVINE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 12040 - 12044 |