EP1982596 - Fungicidal active agent compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Deutschland GmbH Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puhl, Thomas, Dr. Am langen Garten 19 50129 Bergheim / DE | 02 /
Terhardt, Josef-Theodor, Dr. Rebenweg 5 52428 Jülich / DE | [2008/43] | Application number, filing date | 07007854.8 | 18.04.2007 | [2008/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982596 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/88, A01N43/653 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
A01N43/653 (EP);
A01N43/88 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/653, A01N43/653, A01N43/88 (EP);
A01N43/88, A01N2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | Fungizide Wirkstoffkombinationen | [2008/43] | English: | Fungicidal active agent compounds | [2008/43] | French: | Associations d'agents actifs fongicides | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2011 | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/16] | 25.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9825465 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 11 * * page 2, line 6 * * page 12; table 1 * * page 47; example 6; table 6 * * page 57; example 11 * * page 60; example 12 * * page 63; example 13 * * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]WO0030440 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 19 - page 5, line 9 * * page 2; compound 3 * * page 3; compound 28 * * pages 7-8 ** claims 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2006040123 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 6 * * pages 33-34; example 3 * * claims 1-8 * | by applicant | WO9825465 | WO0030440 | WO2006040123 | - The Pesticide Manual, (2003), page 304 |