EP1983548 - Emitter chamber, charged particle apparatus and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICT Integrated Circuit Testing Gesellschaft für Halbleiterprüftechnik mbH Ammerthalstrasse 20a 85551 Heimstetten / DE | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adamec, Pavel Am See 29 85540 Haar / DE | 02 /
Zhou, Fang Sonnenstrasse 19 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008107.0 | 20.04.2007 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983548 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/073, H01J37/18, H01J7/18 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/065 (EP,US);
H01J37/073 (EP,US);
H01J37/18 (EP,US);
H01J7/18 (EP,US);
H01J2237/022 (EP,US);
H01J2237/06341 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/27] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Emitterkammer, Ladungsträgerteilchenstrahlvorrichtung und Bedienungsverfahren | [2008/43] | English: | Emitter chamber, charged particle apparatus and method for operating same | [2008/43] | French: | Chambre d'émetteur, appareil à particule chargée et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB953801 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [Y] 10 * page 1, lines 60-84 * * page 2, lines 22-27 * * claims 1-5 *; | [XY]US3678333 (COATES VINCENT J, et al) [X] 1-8,11-15,18,19,22-27,32 * abstract * * column 2, lines 67-75 * * column 3, lines 55-60 * * column 3, line 74 - column 5, line 59 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 6 * * claims 1-5 * [Y] 9,10; | [XY]US5111054 (SLINGERLAND HENDRIK N [NL]) [X] 1-8,11,14-18,22-26,28,29 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 8 * [Y] 27,30-32; | [A]US5150001 (CREWE ALBERT V [US]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * column 2 ** column 4 *; | [XY]US5399860 (MIYOSHI MOTOSUKE [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13,15,16,19-25 * abstract * * column 4, lines 45-52 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 24 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 2 * [Y] 27,30-32; | [Y]US2003081726 (KOCH LOTHAR [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2006231773 (KATAGIRI SOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11,13-16,18,19,22-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0132] , [0136] *; | [Y] - LI YULIN ET AL, "Design and pumping characteristics of a compact titanium-vanadium non-evaporable getter pump", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY A. VACUUM, SURFACES AND FILMS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199805), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 1139 - 1144, XP012003912 [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 1139, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.581248 |