EP1849640 - Motor cooling device on the roof of an omnibus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gietl, Karl Furtweg 47 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | 02 /
Killy, Alois Im Goldenen Tal 2 83629 Naring Weyarn / DE | 03 /
Blümel, Gottfried Ahornweg 3 85235 Odelzhausen / DE | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008165.8 | 21.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | DE20061018995 | 25.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018995 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849640 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1849640 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849640 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorkühlung auf dem Dach eines Omnibusses | [2007/44] | English: | Motor cooling device on the roof of an omnibus | [2007/44] | French: | Refroidissement du moteur sur le toit d'un omnibus | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2007 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | AT | 21.04.2020 | GB | 21.04.2020 | IE | 21.04.2020 | LU | 21.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
AT | 21.04.2020 | ||
GB | 21.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
GB | 21.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1921588 (SIMMON KARL A) [X] 1 * page 2, line 12 - line 40 * * figure 1 * [I] 2-14; | [A]GB1346998 (BRITISH LEYLAND TRUCK & BUS) [A] 1-14 * page 1 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]FR2448449 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 20 - line 30 * * figure 4 * [I] 4-14; | [A]JPS637026U (NISSAN) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS6335618U (NISSAN) [A] 1,4,6,12-14 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]JPH04185575 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19960616 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6-9 * column 4 - column 4 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2002195090 (MARSH GREGORY A [US], et al) [A] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] ** figures 4-6 * |