EP1982644 - Analytical system for detecting an analyte in a body fluid and disposable integrated puncturing and analyzing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2015/40] |
Former [2008/43] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haar, Hans-Peter Waldstrasse 2 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 02 /
Hoenes, Joachim Rodauer Str. 50a 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 03 /
Horn, Carina Frankenstrasse 5 68647 Biblis / DE | 04 /
Poredda, Andreas Neckargruen 5 68259 Mannheim / DE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Petirsch, Markus, et al Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2008/48] | Petirsch, Markus, et al Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Petirsch, Markus, et al Patentanwälte Durm & Partner Beiertheimer Allee 19 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008167.4 | 21.04.2007 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982644 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982644 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61B5/151 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150442 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/151 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
A61B5/15188 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | A61B5/00, A61B5/151, G01N33/487 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Analytisches System zum Nachweisen eines Analyten in Körperflüssigkeit und integriertes Einweg-Punktions- und Analyseelement | [2008/43] | English: | Analytical system for detecting an analyte in a body fluid and disposable integrated puncturing and analyzing element | [2008/43] | French: | Système analytique pour détecter une analyte dans un liquide du corps et perforation jetable intégrée et élément d'analyse | [2015/39] |
Former [2008/43] | Système analytique pour détecter une analyse dans un liquide du corps et perforation jetable intégrée et élément d'analyse | Examination procedure | 27.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11161430.1 / EP2363062 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2007 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | IE | 21.04.2016 | LU | 21.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.04.2007 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 21.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.04.2007 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
IE | 21.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1174083 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0010]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1189064 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1402812 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1a-d *; | [Y]EP1466558 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0041] , [0048] , [0054]; figures 1a-e *; | [A]WO2005102154 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0042]; figures 3-5 * | by applicant | WO2005006985 | WO2006092281 |