EP1855251 - Method and system for processing batches of mail to increase efficiency of the mailstream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Murray D. 24 Riding Club Road Wilton Connecticut 06897 / US | 02 /
Wall, Joseph E. 1338 Brookside Drive Fairfield Connecticut 06430 / US | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
Martin, Murray D. 40 Hull Place Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US | ||
02 /
Wall, Joseph E. 1338 Brookside Drive Fairfield Connecticut 06430 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008673.1 | 27.04.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | US20060416668 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: US 416668 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855251 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G07B17/00467 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/30] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für die Verarbeitung von Poststapeln zur Erhöhung der Effizienz des Poststroms | [2007/46] | English: | Method and system for processing batches of mail to increase efficiency of the mailstream | [2007/46] | French: | Procédé et système de traitement de lots de courrier pour augmenter l'efficacité du flux du courrier | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5068797 (SANSONE RONALD P [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 5a,5b * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 62 * * column 9, line 54 - column 12, line 52 * * column 14, line 5 - column 15, line 9 *; | [A]US5995950 (BARNS-SLAVIN ILEANA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 21 - line 62 ** column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 35 *; | [X]US2005165704 (LOPEZ STEVEN W [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * claims 1,2 * | by applicant | US5068797 | US5995950 | US2005165704 |