Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
15.01.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.08.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.05.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
30.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.01.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
19.01.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.01.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
21.08.2009 | First examination report | |
15.08.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.05.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
15.05.2009 | Change - classification | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
25.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
05.10.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
05.10.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |