EP1832290 - Compositions and methods for use in targeting vascular destruction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXIGENE, INC. 230 Third Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | For all designated states BAYLOR UNIVERSITY 1311 South Fifth Street Waco, TX 76798 / US | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pero, Ronald W. Tomaplatsen 3 223 63 Lund / SE | 02 /
Sherris, David 37 Neillian Crescent Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | 03 /
Pinney, Kevin G. 717 Topeka Drive Woodway, Texas 76712 / US | 04 /
Mocharla, Vani P. 1515, DSouth 9th Street, Apt. 314 Waco, Texas 76706 / US | 05 /
Chen, Zhi 1719 Sirnon Place 3B4 West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07008854.7 | 16.02.2000 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | US19990120478P | 18.02.1999 Original published format: US 120478 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832290 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832290 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/661, A61K31/6615, A61K31/664 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C07F9/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/29] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Verwendung beim Targeting von vaskulärer Zerstörung | [2007/37] | English: | Compositions and methods for use in targeting vascular destruction | [2007/37] | French: | Compositions et procédés d'utilisation pour le ciblage de la destruction vasculaire | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/46] | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00914606.9 / EP1152764 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000914606) is 29.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9839332 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [I] 1-4 * claims 1,28-58 *; | [Y] - UEDA Y ET AL, "NOVEL WATER SOLUBLE PHOSPHATE PRODRUGS OF TAXOL POSSESSING IN VIVO ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1993), vol. 3, no. 8, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1761 - 1766, XP000570975 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)80058-X | [Y] - VYAS D M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ANTITUMOR EVALUATION OF WATER SOLUBLE TAXOL PHOSPHATES", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1993), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1357 - 1360, XP000570956 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)80348-0 | [Y] - DARK G G ET AL, "COMBRETASTATIN A-4 AN AGENT THAT DISPLAYS POTENT AND SELECTIVE TOXICITY TOWARD TUMOR VASCULATURE", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (199705), vol. 57, no. 10, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1829 - 1834, XP002929410 [Y] 1-4 * page 1829 * | [I] - CHEN K ET AL, "ANTITUMOR AGENTS. 178. SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF SUBSTITUTED 2-ARYL-1,8-NAPHTHYRIDIN-4(1H)-ONES AS ANTITUMOR AGENTS THAT INHIBIT TUBULIN POLYMERIZATION", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM970146H, (19970101), vol. 40, no. 19, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3049 - 3056, XP002069232 [I] 1-4 * abstract; scheme 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970146h | [I] - CHEN K ET AL, "ANTITUMOR AGENTS. 174. 2',3',4',5,6,7-SUBSTITUTED 2-PHENYL-1,8-NAPTHTYRIDIN-4-ONES: THEIR SYNTHESIS, CYTOTOXICITY, AND INHIBITION OF TUBULIN POLYMERIZATION", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM960858S, (19970101), vol. 40, no. 14, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2266 - 2275, XP000882947 [I] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960858s |