EP1987736 - Device for storing flat objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engelbrecht, Moritz Thalkirchener Strasse 59 80337 München / DE | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Körner, Ekkehard Kroher * Strobel, Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009063.4 | 04.05.2007 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987736 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987736 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47B81/06, A47F7/14 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
A47B81/068 (EP);
B42F17/14 (EP);
G11B33/0483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] |
Former [2009/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren flacher Gegenstände | [2008/45] | English: | Device for storing flat objects | [2008/45] | French: | Dispositif de stockage d'objets plats | [2010/07] |
Former [2008/45] | Dispositif de surveillance d'objets plats | Examination procedure | 13.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 29.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | MT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | LU | 04.05.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
LU | 04.05.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2285434 (SUN HING AUDIO EQUIPMENT MFY L [HK]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 26; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-12; | [A]DE19619372 (POEHLER HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 24; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0793928 (MCKECHNIE UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE29818616U (OSTERLOH SWEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2285434 |