EP1878409 - Device for immobilising lower limbs of patients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORER, Karl Greinwaldnerstrasse 12 39031 Pfalzen / IT | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009235.8 | 08.05.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | DE20062010947U | 14.07.2006 Original published format: DE 202006010947 U | [2008/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1878409 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1878409 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/37, A61G13/00, A61B19/00, A61G7/075, A61F5/04, // A61B5/055 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
A61G13/12 (EP);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B5/702 (US);
A61B6/04 (EP);
A61B6/0421 (EP);
A61F5/3761 (EP);
A61B90/14 (EP);
A61G13/1235 (EP);
A61G13/1245 (EP);
A61G13/125 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/03] | A61F5/37, A61G13/00, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/43] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ruhigstellung von unteren Extremitäten von Patienten | [2008/03] | English: | Device for immobilising lower limbs of patients | [2008/03] | French: | Dispositif pour l'immobilisation de membres inférieurs de patients | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2829640 (MOORMAN JOSEPH C) [X] 1,2,5,12,14,15 * column 1, lines 15,16 * * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, lines 28-34; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5020525 (EWING JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,14,15 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO9831284 (FORER KARL [IT]) [X] 1-6,12,14-16 * page 2, lines 13-15 * * page 4, lines 32-35; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0145601 (GUHL JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9 * page 5, lines 2-10; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004059268 (POLONCHEK JEANNA S [US]) [A] 9,11,13* paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0024]; figures 1,6 *; | [XY]US2004093673 (MARSHALL MABEL E [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0025] - [0029]; figures 1,5,6A; claim 20 * [Y] 5,11; | [XDY]DE202005012178U (FORER KARL [IT]) [XD] 1-10,12-16 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0029] , [0035] , [0040]; figures 1,3-5; claims 1,10,11 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * [Y] 5,11 |