EP1810889 - Knee protecting airbag device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | [2010/11] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotta, Naoki Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 02 /
Nagata, Atsushi Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 03 /
Takimoto, Masahiro Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 04 /
Hashimoto, Masakazu Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | [2010/09] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
Hotta, Naoki Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagata, Atsushi Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | |||
03 /
Takimoto, Masahiro Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | |||
04 /
Hashimoto, Masakazu Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho, Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009239.0 | 21.12.2004 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | JP20030427715 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003427715 | JP20040082546 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004082546 | JP20040089184 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004089184 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1810889 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1810889 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810889 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1810889 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1810889 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/205, B60R21/217, B60R21/215 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B60R21/2171 (EP,US);
B60R21/206 (EP,US);
B60R21/26 (EP,US);
B60R21/261 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23169 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | B60R21/205, B60R21/217 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/30] | Title | German: | Airbagvorrichtung zum Knieschutz | [2007/30] | English: | Knee protecting airbag device | [2007/30] | French: | Coussin gonflable de protection des genoux | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 01.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04030335.6 / EP1550588 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/47] | FR | 03.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1260417 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0160]; figures 18-25 *; | [A]EP1314617 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0109] - [0117]; figures 16-18 *; | [A]US2003107206 (TAKIMOTO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0346] - [0351]; figures 87-89 * |