EP1990549 - Connecting device and method for creating a connection between a first component and a second component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baur, Franz Hochsträss 13 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | For all designated states Haser, Franz Buchenegg 5 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | For all designated states Lamello AG Hauptstrasse 149 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baur, Franz Hochsträss 13 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | 02 /
Haser, Franz Buchenegg 5 87534 Oberstaufen / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Wilfried Gstaltenstrasse 20 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009266.3 | 08.05.2007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990549 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20, E05B63/12 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F16B12/2009 (EP,US);
E05B63/123 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0062 (EP,US);
A47B87/002 (EP,US);
E04B1/6183 (EP,US);
E04B2001/6195 (EP,US);
E05B2047/0017 (EP,US);
E05B47/0012 (EP,US);
F16B2200/205 (EP,US);
Y10S403/12 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1041 (EP,US);
Y10T403/55 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | Verbindungsmittel und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Verbindung eines ersten Bauteils und eines zweiten Bauteils | [2008/46] | English: | Connecting device and method for creating a connection between a first component and a second component | [2008/46] | French: | Moyen d'attache et procédé de fabrication d'une liaison entre un premier composant et un second | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 23.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1224228 (SOLAINI PETER [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,1 *; | [A]US1427658 (HENRI VENTRE) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US1438164 (ANDREW FREDERICK W) [X] 1-11 * page 1, column 2, paragraph L - page 2, column 2, paragraph 3; figures 1-8 *; | [X]FR603788 (BECHU) [X] 1-11,40-46 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202005009004U (BITTNER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | Examination | DE7400246U | GB1571697 | DE3123185 | FR2599439 |