EP1856963 - Agricultural ground roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldhaus, Werner Huntloser Strasse 12a 27801 Dötlingen / DE | 02 /
Tiessen, Reimer Uwe Zaunkönigstrasse 69a 26135 Oldenberg / DE | 03 /
Reinke, Wilfried Bürgereschstrasse 78 26123 Oldenburg / DE | 04 /
Steen, Rüdiger Hohenkamp 4 27798 Hude / DE | [2007/47] | Application number, filing date | 07009385.1 | 10.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | DE20061022536 | 15.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022536 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856963 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01B29/04 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A01B29/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Bodenwalze | [2007/47] | English: | Agricultural ground roller | [2007/47] | French: | Rouleau agricole de sol | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8814135U (RABEWERK HEINRICH CLAUSING, 4515 BAD ESSEN, DE) [X] 1 * page 10, paragraphs 1,2,4 * * page 13, paragraphs 1,2 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE9205660U (MASCHINENFABRIK RAU GMBH, 7315 WEILHEIM, DE) [X] 1-3,5,7,10 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraphs 3-5 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0878328 (OTICO [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 12 * * column 5, line 32 - line 53 * * column 6, line 8 - line 18 ** figure -; claim - *; | [X]FR2784331 (OTICO [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * abstract * * page 6, line 5 - line 14 * * page 10, line 1 - line 8 * * page 11, line 13 - line 23 * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DD270495 | EP0223134 | DE4018366 | EP0401592 |