EP1992552 - Armrest structure of the back-seat of the heavy duty motorcycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yicheng Sports Co., Ltd. 470, Chang Shui Rd., Sec. 4 Pituo Hsiang Changhua 523 / TW | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yen, Yu-Chuan 470, Chang Shui Rd., Sec. 4, PITUO Hsiang Changhua 523 / TW | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry, et al RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft, Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009704.3 | 15.05.2007 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992552 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62J27/00, B62J39/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B62J25/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Armlehnenstruktur auf dem Rücksitz eines schweren Motorrads | [2008/47] | English: | Armrest structure of the back-seat of the heavy duty motorcycle | [2008/47] | French: | Structure d'accoudoir de siège arrière d'une motocyclette puissante | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s) TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ | 13.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2626545 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]CA2419169 (TROTTIER STEVE [CA]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 5 *; | [A]EP1369346 (CASETTA ALBERTO [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004026675 (BOURGUIGNON ERIC CELESTIN [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2004035374 (OGNISSANTI STEFANO [IT], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 24 - page 8, line 9; figures 1B,5 *; | [A]CA2458945 (LACOURSIERE CHARLES-ANTOINE [CA], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | WO2004035374 |