EP1857219 - Tooling head mounted structural positioning systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burton, Kurt A. 429 Nantucket Pointe Drive Wildwood MO 63040 / US | 02 /
Matlack, Mike P. 519 Crown Passage St. Charles MO 63303 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07009787.8 | 16.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | US20060383840 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: US 383840 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857219 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857219 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q9/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
B23Q9/0028 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49998 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5177 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53091 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Auf einem Werkzeugkopf montiertes strukturelles Positionierungssystem und Verfahren | [2007/47] | English: | Tooling head mounted structural positioning systems and methods | [2007/47] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de positionnement structurel montés sur tête d'outil | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2010 | BE | 24.03.2010 | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | IT | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | MT | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | IE | 16.05.2010 | LU | 16.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | ES | 05.07.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.05.2010 | ||
LU | 16.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CY | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 16.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
BE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
ES | 05.07.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 24.03.2010 | |
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2676624 (GECMEN ARTHUR C) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]GB1163299 (SENTRALINSTITUT FOR IND FORSKN [NO]) [X] 1* figure 2 *; | [X]US4244104 (GRUBE GEORGE) [X] 1 * figure 4 *; | [XY]JPS56102410 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3-5,8-10,12-15 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [X]JPS58100748 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2148170 (ATLAS COPCO AB) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [X]EP0314954 (CRONES & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]GB2216460 (PREECE ROY ALAN) [X] 1 * figure 3 * |