EP1833012 - Communication method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Libman, Richard 10947 E. Lillian Lane Scottsdale, Arizona 85259 / US | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07009873.6 | 21.07.1999 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1833012 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1833012 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für Mitteilungen | [2007/37] | English: | Communication method and apparatus | [2007/37] | French: | Méthode et système de communication | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99305782.7 / EP1071030 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990305782) is 23.03.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4752675 (ZETMEIR KARL D [US]) [A] 34-37 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0354260 (C P C INVESTMENT TRUST [US]) [A] 34-37 * the whole document *; | [T]US5039075 (MAYER THEODORE W [US]) [T] 34-37 * cited as evidence of general knowledge in respect of the use of so-called "response documents" in direct mail advertising campaigns, cf. col.1 l.12-24 *; | [X]US5619558 (JHEETA ELIZABETH A [US]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9734246 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]US5721831 (WAITS TOYA [US], et al) [A] 1-37* the whole document *; | [X]US5806057 (GORMLEY MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9912115 (CATALINA MARKETING INT [US]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9922328 (JONES CHARLES L III [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X] - LOEFFLER L, "Computer helps marketers romance' business clients", MARKETING NEWS, AMERICAN MARKETING ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO, IL,, US, (19880314), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0025-3790, pages 8 - 9, XP009091756 [X] 34-37 * the whole document * * in particular paragraph bridging p.8-9 * | [X] - PITCHON J, "Using the computer to convert advertising enquiries into sales", BEST'S REVIEW. PROPERTY - CASUALTY INSURANCE EDITION, A.M. BEST,, US, (198302), vol. 83, no. 10, ISSN 0161-7745, pages 62 - 64, XP009091754 [X] 34-37 * the whole document * | [X] - ALPETER V R, "Market Fax: Computerized Support for Sales and Marketing", SMALL BUSINESS COMPUTERS, (198305), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 51 - 53, XP001536669 [X] 34-37 * the whole document * | [A] - MARIANNE SELLER AND PAUL GRAY, "A Survey of Database Marketing", GRADUATE SCHOOL OF MANAGEMENT AND DEPARTMENT OF INFORMATION AND COMPUTER SCIENCE, UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, US, (199903), pages 1 - 45, URL: http://www.crito.uci.edu/itr/publications/pdf/survey_db_mktg.pdf, (20070731), XP007902726 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | [A] - PEARSON S, "A LASTING RELATIONSHIP (DATABASES IN DIRECT MARKETING)", MARKETING, HAYMARKET PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (19860522), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0025-3650, pages 49 - 50,52, XP001146169 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | [A] - "VARIABLE-DATA PRINTING COMES OF AGE: CAPABILITIES & MARKET DEMAND CONVERGE", SEYBOLD REPORT ON PUBLISHING SYSTEMS, MEDIA, PA, US, (19970915), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0736-7260, pages 3 - 24, XP000865685 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | [A] - OPPENHEIMER J N, "HAND-IN-HAND PROFIT FOR MARKETING AND DATA PROCESSING", DIRECT MARKETING, HOKE COMMUNICATIONS, GARDEN CITY, NY, US, (198510), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0012-3188, pages 60 - 65,92,137,, XP001536616 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * |