EP1884406 - Segmented brake light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsai, Chou-Pai No. 31, Lin 8, Guosing Village Sanjiepu, Shueishang Hsiang Chiayi Hsien, Taiwan / TW | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009887.6 | 05.08.2006 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884406 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/44 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
B60Q1/444 (EP);
B60Q1/441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Segmentiertes Bremslicht | [2008/06] | English: | Segmented brake light | [2008/06] | French: | Feu de freinage segmenté | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06016383.9 / EP1886872 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3638181 (BRYANT ENSOR ALEXANDER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4950850 (KAMIMURA TAIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5534672 (MEAGHER JAMES P [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 9 * * figures 12-14 *; | [A]GB2328092 (HALL CHRISTOPHER PETER [GB]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US6753769 (ELLIOTT LAWRENCE T [US]) [A] 1* figure 6a *; | [E]AU2006100673 (TSAI CHOU PAI [TW]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document * |