EP1820790 - 3-alkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and 3,3'-dialkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and processes for making them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/34] | 3-Alkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'binaphthols and 3,3'-dialkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and process for making them | ||
[2009/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l. Talstrasse 80 8001 Zürich / CH | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Helen S.M. 209 Knoll Road Wallingford, PA 19086 / US | 02 /
Qiu, Weiming 303 Charleston Drive Wilmington DE 19808 / US | 03 /
Shapiro, Rafael 1415 Fresno Road Wilmington DE 19803 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Lu, Helen S.M. 209 Knoll Road Wallingford, PA 19086 / US | ||
02 /
Qiu, Weiming 303 Charleton Drive Wilmington DE 19808 / US | |||
03 /
Shapiro, Rafael 1415 Fresno Road Wilmington DE 19803 / US | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07010025.0 | 20.11.2002 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | US20010994099 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: US 994099 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820790 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1820790 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820790 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/17, C07C37/14, C07C37/18, C07C37/11, C07C37/16 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07C39/17 (EP,KR,US);
C07C37/11 (EP,US);
C07C37/14 (EP,US);
C07C37/16 (EP,US);
C07C37/18 (EP,US);
C07C2601/10 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/11, C07C39/17 (US,EP);
C07C37/14, C07C39/17 (EP,US);
C07C37/16, C07C39/17 (US,EP);
C07C37/18, C07C39/17 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/34] | C07C39/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | 3-alkylierte 5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'Binaphthole und 3,3'-dialkylierte 5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-Binaphthole sowie Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/34] | English: | 3-alkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and 3,3'-dialkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and processes for making them | [2009/49] | French: | Binaphtholes 2,2 d'alkylat 3-octoahydro-3-5,5',6,6',7,7', et binaphtholes 2,2- d'alkylat 3,3-octoahydro-3-5,5',6,6',7,7'8,8' et leur processus de fabrication | [2009/49] |
Former [2007/34] | 3-Alkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'binaphthols and 3,3'-dialkylated-5,5',6,6',7,7',8,8'-octahydro-2,2'-binaphthols and process for making them | ||
Former [2007/34] | Binaphtholes2,2 d'alkylat 3-octoahydro-3-5,5',6,6',7,7', et binaphtholes2,2- d'alkylat 3,3-octoahydro-3-5,5',6,6',7,7'8,8' et leur processus de fabrication | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 18.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02789788.3 / EP1465851 | Divisional application(s) | EP10179048.3 / EP2275397 | EP10179062.4 / EP2279994 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | IE | 20.11.2011 | LU | 20.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 20.11.2011 | ||
LU | 20.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 20.11.2011 | ||
LU | 20.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
IE | 20.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA] - R. R. SCHROCK ET AL, "New Chiral Molybdenum Catalysts for Asymmetric Olefin Metathesis that Contain 3,3'-Disubstituted Octahydrobinaphtholate or 2,6-Dichlorophenylimido Ligands", ORGANOMETALLICS., ACS, COLUMBUS, OH., US, (20020121), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 409 - 417, XP002232516 [PA] 1-3 * page 410, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om0107441 | [A] - S. L. AEILTS ET AL, "A Readily Available and User-Friendly Chiral Catalyst for Efficient Enantioselective Olefin Metathesis", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (20010417), vol. 40, no. 8, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 1452 - 1456, XP001004954 [A] 1-6 * page 1455, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20010417)40:8<1452::AID-ANIE1452>3.0.CO;2-G | by applicant | US5235113 | WO9906146 | WO9962855 | - AEILTS, S. L. ET AL., Angewandte Chemie International Edition, VERLAG CHEMIE, (20010417), vol. 40, pages 1452 - 1456 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1997), page 5273 |