Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
29.06.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.04.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.10.2010 | First examination report | |
26.10.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.06.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.02.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
23.10.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
20.10.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.08.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
27.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.06.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
26.10.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |