Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7476009 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2009 | B2 | US2007274076 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006145540 | 25.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007316312 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006145540 | 25.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1860497 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2009 | A3 | EP1860497 | 28.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2006145540 | 25.05.2006 |