EP1860497 - Projector and lamp module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1 7-chome Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doi, Naohito c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 7-1-7-Chome,Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Ochi, Masaki c/o FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 7-1-7-Chome,Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010164.7 | 22.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20060145540 | 25.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006145540 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860497 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860497 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/20 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G03B21/145 (EP,US);
G03B21/2046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/48] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Projektor und Lampeneinheit | [2007/48] | English: | Projector and lamp module | [2007/48] | French: | Projecteur et module de lampe | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 19.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1006734 (MINOLTA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4* paragraphs [0200] , [0201]; figures 40,41 *; | [Y]EP1093013 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0034]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]DE10117069 (OPTOMO CORP [TW]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 2,4 *; | [Y]US6345896 (KUROSAWA SHOGO [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US2004233400 (KYOTO TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [XY]US2005024601 (MORINAGA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 2,5 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2004347789 | JP2005043603 |