EP1845161 - Nucleic acid sequences to proteins involved in tocopherol synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calgene LLC 1920 Fifth Street Davis, CA 95626 / US | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Subramaniam, Sai, S. 137 E. Foxboro Street Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
Slater, Steven C. 21 Brucewood Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
Karberg, Katherine 908 N. Ballas Road St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | 04 /
Chen, Ridong 100 E. Beach Drive, No. 202 Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | 05 /
Valentin, Henry, E. 873 Foxsprings Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 06 /
Wong, Yun-Hua, Huang 14043 Forest Crest Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010187.8 | 13.04.2001 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | US20000549848 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: US 549848 | US20000688069 | 14.10.2000 Original published format: US 688069 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845161 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/60, C12N15/82, A01H5/00, A23K1/00, C11B1/00, C12P17/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
C12N9/1085 (EP,US);
A23D9/007 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
C11B3/001 (EP,US);
C11B3/12 (EP,US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäuresequenzen für an der Tocopherol-Synthese beteiligte Proteine | [2007/42] | English: | Nucleic acid sequences to proteins involved in tocopherol synthesis | [2007/42] | French: | Séquences d'acide nucléique vers des protéines impliquées dans la synthèse de tocophérol | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01927055.2 / EP1274850 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB560529 (DISTILLATION PRODUCTS INC) [X] 22-25 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0531639 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DX] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9904622 (UNIV NEVADA [US]) [Y] 26-41 * abstract * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 16; examples 9-11; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]WO0010380 (UNIV NEVADA [US]) [Y] 26-41* the whole document *; | [PX]WO0063391 (CALGENE LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - BEVAN, M., ET AL., "EU Arabidopsis sequencing project - Arabidopsis thaliana DNA chromosome 4, BAC clone F4D11 (ESSAII project);", TREMBL DATABASE, (19980801), XP002193029 [X] 1-9 * accession no. O65524 * | [X] - KANEKO, T., ET AL., "Sequence analysis of the genome of the unicellular cyanobacterium Synechocystis sp. strain PCC6803. I. Sequence features in the 1 Mb region from map positions 64% to 92% of the genome;", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, (19961031), XP002193030 [X] 1-3,10,11 * accession no. D90909 * | [X] - KANEKO, T., ET AL., "Sequence analysis of the genome of the unicellular cyanobacterium Synechocystis sp. strain PCC6803. II. Sequence determination of theentire genome and assignment of potential protein-coding regions - hypothetical protein slr1737 - Synechocystis sp. (strain PCC 6803)", TREMBL DATABASE, (19970201), XP002193031 [X] 1-3,10-12 * accession no. P73727 * | [X] - CHEN, J., ET AL., "Arabidopsis thaliana Gene Expression MicroArray - 701673779 A. thaliana, Columbia Col-0, inflorescence-1 Arabidopsis thaliana cDNA clone 701673779, mRNA sequence", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, (19990909), XP002193032 [X] 1-9 * accession no. AI995392 * | [A] - STOCKER A ET AL, "Identification of the Tocopherol-cyclase in the blue-green algae Anabaena variabilis Kützing (Cyanobacteria)", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL, CH, (1993), vol. 76, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1729 - 1738, XP002134836 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19930760429 | [A] - ARANGO YOLANDA ET AL, "Tocopherol synthesis from homogentisate in Capsicum anuum L. (yellow pepper) chromoplast membranes: Evidence for tocopherol cyclase.", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (19981215), vol. 336, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 531 - 533, XP002193027 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - STOCKER, A. , ET AL., "the substrate specificity of tocopherol cyclase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 4, no. 7, pages 1129 - 1134, XP002193028 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0896(96)00125-3 |