EP1844751 - Discharge device for steam rooms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe AG Auestrasse 5 - 9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Heese, Juriaan Kometensingel 118 1033 BX Amsterdam / NL | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010587.9 | 05.01.2005 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | DE20041006455 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004006455 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844751 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1844751 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/10, A61H33/06 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
A61H33/063 (EP);
A61H33/10 (EP);
A61H2033/068 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | A61H33/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | Austrittseinrichtung für Dampfkabinen | [2007/42] | English: | Discharge device for steam rooms | [2007/42] | French: | Dispositif de sortie pour sauna | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05000101.5 / EP1561447 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05137771 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]DE29801194U (MEIER HANSJUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE20100427U (HOESCH METALL & KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [X] 2,4,6,10,11,15 * the whole document * [A] 1 |