EP1870300 - Curtain-type airbag apparatus and airbag module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hidaka, Nobuyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Nakai, Kouzaburou c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Inazu, Tadashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Fukuda, Takeru c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
Hidaka, Nobuyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakai, Kouzaburou c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Inazu, Tadashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
Fukuda, Takeru c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
Hidaka, Nobuyuki Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakai, Kouzaburou Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Inazu, Tadashi Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
Fukuda, Takeru Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010629.9 | 29.05.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | JP20060174013 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006174013 | JP20060314103 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006314103 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870300 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870300 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/213, B60R21/231 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B60R21/213 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R21/217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/36] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorhangähnliche Airbagvorrichtung und Airbagmodul | [2007/52] | English: | Curtain-type airbag apparatus and airbag module | [2007/52] | French: | Appareil d'airbag de type rideau et module d'airbag | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6149185 (WHITE JR MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,6-11,13-15; | [A]DE20118457U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XA]EP1256492 (INDUSTRIALESUD SPA [IT]) [X] 5 * figure 4 * [A] 1-4,6-11,13-15; | [XA]EP1359061 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 5 * figure 6 * [A] 1-4,6-11,13-15; | [A]US2004061316 (ELQADAH WAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 4 *; | [A]WO2006062738 (KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |