EP1862353 - Rear light with brake light and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebel, Matthias Theresienstrasse 69 80333 München / DE | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010640.6 | 29.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | DE20062008501U | 29.05.2006 Original published format: DE 202006008501 U | [2007/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862353 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/44, B62J6/04 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
B60Q1/445 (EP,US);
B62J6/045 (EP,US);
B62J6/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/33] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rückleuchte mit Bremslicht und deren Verfahren | [2007/49] | English: | Rear light with brake light and method therefor | [2007/49] | French: | Feu arrière doté d'un feu stop tout comme son procédé | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3639898 (BOOTH ROBERT G) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8600055 (LOEHDEFINK WOLF DIETER) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]US6424256 (RYDER ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1571071 (BRACKEN GERALD [IE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * |