EP1862438 - Rheology modifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10 Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyanagi, Koji c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratoires 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 02 /
Yamato, Fujio 129-4, Ena Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Toshiharu c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratoires 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 04 /
Yamamuro, Hotaka c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratoires 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010678.6 | 30.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | JP20060153175 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006153175 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862438 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1862438 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, C04B40/00, // C04B18/14, C04B24/04, C04B103/40 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C04B40/0042 (EP,US);
C09K3/00 (KR);
C04B20/1018 (EP,US);
C04B2103/0079 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/1018, C04B18/146 (US,EP);
C04B40/0042, C04B18/146, C04B24/003, C04B24/12 (US,EP);
C04B40/0042, C04B18/146, C04B24/12, C04B24/20 (EP,US);
C04B40/0042, C04B18/146, C04B24/20, C04B2103/404 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, NL [2017/27] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rheologiemodifikator | [2007/49] | English: | Rheology modifier | [2007/49] | French: | Modificateur de rhéologie | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2450681 (RHONE POULENC SA) [Y] 1,3-9 * page 2, lines 8-26 *; | [Y]JPH10226550 (NOF CORP) [Y] 1-3* abstract *; | [Y]EP1266875 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] , [0047] , [0050] , [0077] * |