EP1862819 - Sensor system for recording the angle resolution of surrounding objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Automotive Distance Control Systems GmbH Kemptener Strasse 99 88131 Lindau / DE | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Randler, Martin Säntisweg 15 88090 Immenstadt / DE | 02 /
Schanz, Holger Kleindorferstrasse 87 89604 Allmendingen / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Klaus Pfannenweg 14 88131 Lindau / DE | 04 /
Schaale, Christian Am Buch 2a 88138 Lindau / DE | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patente & Lizenzen Sieboldstrasse 19 D-90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Büchner, Jörg Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstr. 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010750.3 | 31.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | DE20061026301 | 02.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006026301 | DE20061031553 | 08.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006031553 | [2007/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862819 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/93 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G01S3/783 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/44] |
Former [2008/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sensorsystem zur winkelaufgelösten Erfassung von Umgebungsobjekten | [2007/49] | English: | Sensor system for recording the angle resolution of surrounding objects | [2007/49] | French: | Système de capteur destiné à la détection résolue de manière angulaire d'objets environnants | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2011 | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/49] | 01.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 21.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SE, IT, GB, FR, ES, DE | 17.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19717399 (SPIES MARTIN DIPL ING FH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5988506 (SCHAHAM MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 6-12; figures 1,3 * * column 3, lines 46-48 * * column 4, lines 12-15,40-50 * * column 5, lines 1-5 *; | [A]DE19932975 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* columns 1,3,5-6; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0040999 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 4, lines 16-37; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]WO03009044 (ADC AUTOMOTIVE DIST CONTROL [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1500952 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5-13 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0016] * |